IL HB4159 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of peace officer targeting. Provides that a person commits the offense when, by reason of the actual or perceived employment as a peace officer of another individual, regardless of the existence of any other motivating factor or factors, he or she commits assault, battery, aggravated assault, intimidation, stalking, cyberstalking, misdemeanor theft, criminal trespass to residence, misdemeanor criminal damage to property, criminal trespass to vehicle, criminal trespass to real property, mob action, disorderly conduct, transmission of obscene messages, harassment by telephone, or harassment through electronic communications. Provides that peace officer targeting is a Class 3 felony for a first offense and a Class 2 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Provides that the State's Attorney of each county shall submit an annual report to the General Assembly outlining: (1) the number of offenses in which a peace officer was a victim, (2) the charges filed, and (3) the ultimate disposition of each case.
Title
PEACE OFFICER-TARGETING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-11-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-10-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-09-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4159&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4159.htm |