IL HB4152 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the definition of "felony".
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Boland |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4152&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4152.htm |