IL HB4144 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, an applicant for a craft grower license who was unable to cure a deficiency in the applicant's craft grower license application in the time period allotted by the Department of Agriculture due to COVID-19: (1) shall have any of the deficient information provided by the applicant to the Department included in the applicant's craft grower license application's score in any award of a craft grower license by the Department during calendar year 2021; (2) the applicant's deficient craft grower license application shall be considered submitted, with the deficient information provided, in the award of the craft grower license by the Department and need not be resubmitted; and (3) shall not pay any additional fee to the Department regarding the applicant's craft grower license application. Effective immediately.
Title
CANNABIS-CRAFT GROWER LICENSES
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-09-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4144&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4144.htm |