IL HB4139 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Subject to appropriation, requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish and administer a teacher reimbursement grant program for the purpose of reimbursing public school teachers for up to 8 semesters or 12 quarters of the tuition and mandatory fees paid to a public institution of higher learning in this State to obtain a Professional Educator License and teach in this State. Provides that eligible applicants shall receive a grant in the form of annual reimbursement payments over a period of up to 10 consecutive years. Sets forth provisions concerning eligibility, the grant amount, disbursement and use of a grant, application for a grant, and rulemaking. Repeals the provisions on July 1, 2040. Effective immediately.
Title
TEACHER-TUITION REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | To Appropriations- Higher Education |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-08-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |