IL HB4117 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. By July 15 of each year, requires certain school boards to report, on their school district's website, a list of the learning materials and activities used for student instruction during the previous school year. Requires that the report also include any procedures that are in effect at each school for the documentation, review, or approval of the learning materials and activities used for student instruction. Specifies the minimum information that must be included in the report. Allows a school district to update the report on an ongoing basis and to utilize collaborative online document or spreadsheet software to update or make additions to the report. Sets forth other requirements. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
SCHCD-LEARNING MATERIAL REPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-08-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-08-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4117&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4117.htm |