IL HB4104 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall implement measures to ensure that the Office of Law Enforcement establishes and maintains a sworn police force of at least 175 personnel by July 1, 2020. Provides that accrual of sworn conservation police officers along with necessary support staff shall be added incrementally beginning with Fiscal Year 2016 with subsequent additions established until the goal is reached. Provides that, anytime the number of sworn officers drops below a minimum of 165, the Department shall immediately implement hiring procedures to reestablish the number of sworn officers back to 175.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSERVATION POLICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-01-29HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
2015-12-04HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
2015-12-02HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2015-12-02HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2015-10-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
2015-09-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
2015-09-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2015-09-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2015-09-02HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2015-09-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2015-09-02HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-004-001
2015-08-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
2015-08-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
2015-08-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley
2015-08-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2015-08-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2015-08-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2015-08-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2015-08-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2015-08-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2015-08-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
2015-08-25HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2015-08-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
2015-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-24HouseRemains in Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2015-03-24HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 006-008-001
2015-03-16HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2015-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2080563b2.2Amended CodeCitation Text
20805805-535Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback