IL HB4101 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984. Creates the General Accounting Office as a legislative support services agency. Provides that the Office shall conduct a thorough review of each State executive branch program with respect to its relevance, efficiency, and effectiveness in obtaining the results required by, or achieving the goals expressed in, the statutes relating to the program. At least annually and also whenever appropriate or required by the circumstances, requires the Office to submit written reports to the General Assembly describing the Office's review of those programs and recommending, without limitation, elimination of any programs that are obsolete or not relevant, efficient, or effective; consolidation of duplicative programs; and steps to improve a program's relevance, efficiency, and effectiveness. Requires the Auditor General and all State agencies to cooperate with and provide requested information to the Office so that the Office can perform its functions and duties.
Title
LEGIS-GENRL ACCOUNTING OFFICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4101&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4101.htm |