IL HB4099 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Requires that the Comptroller publish each comprehensive annual financial report (CAFR) within 6 months after the end of the fiscal year to which the report relates. Requires that the Comptroller give notice of a publication delay to the Governor and legislative leaders and on the Comptroller's official website. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
COMPTROLLER-CAFR DEADLINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-30 | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-30 | House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote; SA 1,2 Motion #2 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Bob Biggins; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Bob Biggins; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Biggins; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Biggins; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-19 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Demuzio | |
2009-05-19 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-04-30 | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Biggins |