IL HB4097 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Removes language providing that any person or entity awarded a craft grower license under specified provisions shall only hold one craft grower license. Requires the Department of Agriculture to issue an additional 30 craft grower licenses on or before December 21, 2021 and an additional 30 craft grower licenses on or before March 15, 2022 under specified conditions. Removes language providing that a craft grower shall not be located within 1,500 feet of another craft grower. Requires each adult use cultivation center or Early Approval Adult Use Cultivation Center License holder that produces THC oil extract to set aside a portion of its total monthly production of THC oil extract to sell to infuser organizations to provide infuser organizations with an adequate supply for their infusion processes. Provides that a transporting organization may transport cannabis or cannabis-infused products to a transporting organization depot or other transporting organization transfer facility. Provides that no cannabis business establishment nor any other person or entity shall engage in advertising that contains any statement or illustration that includes a description of or reference to a cannabis product as "craft", unless that product or the raw material used to create that product is produced by a craft grower. Provides that the tax imposed under the Cannabis Cultivation Privilege Tax Law shall not be assessed against or collected from any craft grower awarded a craft grower license under the Act until 2 years after the date that the license is awarded to the craft grower. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS-CRAFT GROWERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-06-15HouseFirst Reading
2021-06-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4107051-10Amended CodeCitation Text
41070530-30Amended CodeCitation Text
41070530-5Amended CodeCitation Text
41070535-31Amended CodeCitation Text
41070540-25Amended CodeCitation Text
41070555-20Amended CodeCitation Text
41070560-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback