IL HB4096 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require each Medicaid Managed Care Organization to list as preferred on the Medicaid Managed Care Organization's preferred drug list every pharmaceutical that is listed as preferred on the Department's preferred drug list. Provides that the Department shall not prohibit, or adopt any rules or policies that prohibit, a Medicaid Managed Care Organization from: (i) covering additional pharmaceuticals that are not listed on the Department's preferred drug list; or (ii) removing from the Medicaid Managed Care Organization's preferred drug list any prior approval requirements applicable under the Department's preferred drug list. Provides that the Department shall not require a Medicaid Managed Care Organization to utilize a single, statewide preferred drug list and shall not prohibit a plan from negotiating drug pricing concessions or rebates on any drug with pharmaceutical companies, unless otherwise required by federal law. Provides that no later than July 1, 2018, the Department shall develop a standardized format for all Medicaid Managed Care Organization preferred drug lists in cooperation with Medicaid Managed Care Organizations and stakeholders, including, but not limited to, community-based organizations, providers, and individuals or entities with expertise in drug formulary development. Requires each Medicaid Managed Care Organization to post its preferred drug list on its website without restricting access to enrolled members and to update the preferred drug list posted on its website within 2 business days of making any changes to the preferred drug list, including, but not limited to, any and all changes to requirements for prior approval. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-MCO-PREFERRED RX LIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-20 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-009-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 007-002-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-006-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-006-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-09-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-09-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-09-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-16.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |