IL HB4095 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-14)
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0589
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-14)
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0589
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a consumer reporting agency may not impose a charge on a consumer for placing a freeze, removing a freeze, or temporarily lifting a freeze. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT FREEZE-NO FEE ALLOWED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0589 |
2018-06-08 | House | Effective Date June 8, 2018 |
2018-06-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-04-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-10-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-10-26 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-10-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-10-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-09-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-09-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-09-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-09-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-09-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-09-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-09-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2MM | Amended Code | Citation Text |