IL HB4095 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a consumer reporting agency may not impose a charge on a consumer for placing a freeze, removing a freeze, or temporarily lifting a freeze. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CREDIT FREEZE-NO FEE ALLOWED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-01SenateArrive in Senate
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-10-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-10-26House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000
2017-10-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-10-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-10-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-10-06HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-09-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-09-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-09-21HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-09-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-09-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-09-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-09-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-09-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-09-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052MMAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback