IL HB4095 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. With respect to fiscal year appropriations, requires the General Assembly to take into account (i) whether the previous fiscal year's revenues were sufficient to pay for all obligations incurred during that fiscal year or whether those obligations were shifted to future years and (ii) whether revenues for the budgeted fiscal year can be reasonably projected to meet appropriations for the budgeted fiscal year. For each budgeted fiscal year, requires the General Assembly, by the same joint resolution adopted by record vote, to declare that the budget is balanced.
Title
BUDGET-DECLARE BALANCED
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Beaubien [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. William Black [R] | Rep. Sandy Cole [R] |
Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Rosemary Mulligan [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-048-000 | |
2010-05-25 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-05-25 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-03-16 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2010-03-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-03-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-03-16 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-044-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-03-16 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-03-16 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-03-16 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-03-16 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-16 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 064-048-000 | |
2010-03-04 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-03-04 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-04 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-04 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-03-04 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-04 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |