IL HB4069 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Evidence-Based Funding for Student Success Act. Amends the Economic Development Area Tax Increment Allocation Act, State Finance Act, Property Tax Code, Illinois Pension Code, Innovation Development and Economy Act, County Economic Development Project Area Property Tax Allocation Act, County Economic Development Project Area Tax Increment Allocation Act of 1991, Illinois Municipal Code, Economic Development Project Area Tax Increment Allocation Act of 1995, School Code, and Educational Opportunity for Military Children Act. Provides that the State aid formula provisions of the School Code apply through the 2016-2017 school year. Provides for an evidence-based funding formula beginning with the 2017-2018 school year. Sets forth provisions concerning an adequacy target calculation, a local capacity calculation, a base funding minimum calculation, a percent of adequacy and final resources calculation, an evidence-based funding formula distribution system, State Superintendent of Education administration of funding and school district submission requirements, and a Professional Review Panel. Makes other changes in the School Code, including changes to contracts with commercial driver training schools; changes to provisions concerning unfunded mandates, including referenda procedures and repealing an existing provision; removing a daily physical education requirement and instead requiring physical education 3 times a week, with exceptions; and changes to charter school funding. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EVIDENCE-BASED FUNDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-06-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-06-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-06-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-21HouseFirst Reading
2017-06-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-06-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-17aAmended CodeCitation Text
105510-19Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-22.20Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-22.34cAmended CodeCitation Text
105510-22.5aAmended CodeCitation Text
105510-29Amended CodeCitation Text
105511E-135Amended CodeCitation Text
105513A-8Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-20.20Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-45Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-50Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-50.10Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-50.15Amended CodeCitation Text
105514-13.01Amended CodeCitation Text
105514-7.02bAmended CodeCitation Text
105514C-1Amended CodeCitation Text
105514C-12Amended CodeCitation Text
105517-1Amended CodeCitation Text
105517-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105517-1.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105517-2.11Amended CodeCitation Text
105517-2AAmended CodeCitation Text
105517-3.6New CodeSee Bill Text
105517-6.5New CodeSee Bill Text
105518-12Amended CodeCitation Text
105518-4.3Amended CodeCitation Text
105518-8.05Amended CodeCitation Text
105518-8.10Amended CodeCitation Text
105518-8.15New CodeSee Bill Text
105518-9Amended CodeCitation Text
10551A-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10551B-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10551B-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10551B-7Amended CodeCitation Text
10551B-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10551C-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10551D-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10551E-20Amended CodeCitation Text
10551F-20Amended CodeCitation Text
10551F-62Amended CodeCitation Text
10551H-20Amended CodeCitation Text
10551H-70Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.109aAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.33Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.51.5Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.66Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.66bAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.84Amended CodeCitation Text
105522-60Repealed CodeCitation Text
105522-62New CodeSee Bill Text
105526-16Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-24.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-7Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-8.1Amended CodeCitation Text
105527A-11Amended CodeCitation Text
105527A-9Amended CodeCitation Text
105529-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10553-14.21Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.30Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-43.1Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-54.5New CodeSee Bill Text
10557-14AAmended CodeCitation Text
1057025Amended CodeCitation Text
206207Amended CodeCitation Text
3010513.2Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-200Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-249Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text
5047033Amended CodeCitation Text
55857Amended CodeCitation Text
559050Amended CodeCitation Text
6511050Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-8Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.6-35Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback