IL HB4046 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In order to provide additional funding beyond the funding awarded to specific after-school programs, requires the State Board of Education to add, in its annual budget proposal, (i) a line item equal to 2% of the After-school Programs, Mentoring and Student Support (ASPMSS) line item for out-of-school time for monitoring, administration, and technical assistance for after-school providers funded by the ASPMSS line item in the State Board of Education's budget proposal; and (ii) a line item equal to 4% of the ASPMSS line item for out-of-school time for grants to qualified, statewide, non-profit agencies to provide capacity building, system development, training, and professional development services. Provides for how the additional appropriations, if any, must be used.
Title
SCH CD-AFTER SCHOOL FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |