IL HB4043 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Use Trust Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture, the Department of Natural Resources, and the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum (currently, the Department of Agriculture and the Department of Natural Resources only) have the power to enter into a trust agreement with a person or group of persons under which the State agency may receive or collect money or other property from the person or group of persons and may expend such money or property solely for a public purpose within the powers and duties of that State agency and stated in the trust agreement.
Title
LINCOLN LIBRARY-PUB USE TRUST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 160 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4043&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4043.htm |