IL HB4042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, excluding any capital improvement tax, the aggregate tax rate levied annually by a school district shall not exceed 4%. Provides that school districts remain subject to (i) particular maximum tax rates set forth under the Code and (ii) the district's limiting rate under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law, if applicable. Requires the State to appropriate and the State Board of Education to distribute to each school district funds sufficient to cover the revenue that the district would have received but for the reduction in its tax rate.
Title
SCH CD-MAX AGG TAX RATE
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 17-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-53.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4042&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4042.htm |