IL HB4036 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act. Provides that all employees, not only those working for an employer having more than 49 employees, covered by the Act are entitled to a total of 12 workweeks of leave during any 12-month period.
Title
VICTIM ECON SECURITY ALL12WKS
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0765 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-042-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-006-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-004-001 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-003-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-026-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-007-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 180 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 180 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |