IL HB4029 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires school districts with a population of 3,000 or more students to interview a minimum percentage of minority candidates for teaching positions. Exempts teaching positions within an English as a Second Language program from the requirement. Sets forth the formula for the school district to use to calculate the minimum percentage required. Provides that if the school district is unable to interview the required minimum percentage of minority candidates for 2 consecutive years, the school district must implement a program for school district employees interested in obtaining a Professional Educator License. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-MINORITY CANDIDATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4029&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4029.htm |