IL HB4025 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Agency and Grantee Bonus Prohibition Act. Provides that no State agency may pay a bonus to its employees. Provides that no entity receiving State grant funds may pay a bonus from grant funds awarded for operational expenses to its employees. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE AGENCY BONUS PROHIBITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2017-05-29 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-29 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-29 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4025&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4025.htm |