IL HB4023 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that State travel reimbursement rates for lodging and mileage for automobile travel, as well as allowances for meals, shall be set at the maximum rates established by the federal government for travel expenses, subsistence expenses, and mileage allowances. Provides that if the rates set under federal regulations increase or decrease during the course of the State's fiscal year, the effective date of the new rate shall be the effective date of the change in the federal rate. Makes conforming and other changes.
Title
STATE TRAVEL REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4023&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4023.htm |