IL HB4005 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a public body shall take all reasonable steps to provide records in a format that is readable by the requester, including, but not limited to, making the record available in any format that is available to the public body and requested by the requester. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA-RESPONSE-FORMAT OF DATA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4005&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4005.htm |