IL HB4001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Relocates language providing that certain persons who drive with suspended or revoked driving privileges shall be issued a Uniform Traffic Citation. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-DRIVING WITHOUT LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-003-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-303.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |