IL HB3963 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pawnbroker Regulation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning violations of the Act.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0713 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 510 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |