IL HB3924 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Authority may not increase toll rates without first obtaining authorization by joint resolution of the General Assembly. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
TOLL HWY-TOLL INCREASES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-01-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-01-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2011-12-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard Morthland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3924&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3924.htm |