IL HB3922 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits a hate crime if the person commits specified crimes by reason of the actual or perceived employment as a peace officer of another individual, regardless of the existence of any other motivating factor or factors.
Title
HATE CRIME-PEACE OFF VICTIM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-10-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3922&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3922.htm |