IL HB3919 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the number of unpaid final determinations determined by ordinance in order for a vehicle to be eligible for immobilization shall not be less than 5.
Title
VEH CD-IMMOBILIZATION-LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-005-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |