IL HB3917 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides findings from the General Assembly concerning the priority of protecting animals from abuse. Provides for appropriate guidelines for enclosed structures for companion animals. Provides that humane care and treatment of animals includes appropriate exercise. Prohibits placing companion animals in life-threatening situations, when considering their age, health, and species. Provides that no person shall without legal justification knowingly or intentionally commit an act that causes a companion animal to suffer great bodily harm.
Title
ANIMALS-HUMANE CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
510 | 70 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 70 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 70 | 3.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 70 | 3.025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3917&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3917.htm |