IL HB3909 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, an individual who is 16 or 17 years of age may register to vote, with the registration held in abeyance by the appropriate election authority until such time as that individual attains the required age to vote. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-PRE-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-13 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-006-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 003-001-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-10 | House | To Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-35.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |