IL HB3903 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that there shall be no place of detention or criminal processing established or maintained on the grounds of any school. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-BOOKING STATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0204
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback