IL HB3898 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Income Withholding for Support Act. Defines "non-employee" as an independent contractor, a vendor, or a person receiving payments who is not an employee and not receiving payments for personal services. Provides that "obligor" includes a non-employee. Provides that the payor shall calculate all applicable deductions to a non-employee obligor's income as if the non-employee were an employee, whether or not the deductions are actually taken from the non-employee obligor's income. Provides that the amount withheld on the remaining balance of payments, paid or payable, to the non-employee shall not be in excess of the maximum amounts permitted under the federal Consumer Credit Protection Act.
Title
SUPPORT-NONEMPLOYEE WITHHLDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0763 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-008-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-008-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-05-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 28 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 28 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |