IL HB3896 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that each school bus manufactured on or after the effective date of this bill and purchased for use in this State shall be equipped with a 3-point seat belt or any other federally approved restraint system in a number sufficient to allow each passenger being transported to use a separate belt or restraint system.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL BUS-SEAT BELT
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | To School Buses Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3896&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3896.htm |