IL HB3895 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that a person is eligible for a diaper allowance of $80 per month per child if all of the following conditions are met: (i) the person's household income is at or below 50% of the federal poverty guidelines; (ii) the person is responsible for the welfare of a child 3 years of age or younger; and (iii) the child who is 3 years of age or younger receives medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the diaper allowance may be used only to purchase diapers and shall be issued through an electronic benefit transfer card. Provides that the diaper allowance is not considered income for purposes of determining eligibility or the amount of assistance for any public aid benefit provided under State law. Effective October 1, 2018.
Title
DHS-DIAPER ALLOWANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3895&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3895.htm |