IL HB3894 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that every contract the Department of Healthcare and Family Services enters into with a managed care organization shall require the managed care organization to: (i) conduct a health assessment on all Medicaid enrollees; and (ii) make at least 3 attempts to contact a Medicaid enrollee within 120 days of a scheduled health assessment if the Medicaid enrollee has not undergone the health assessment by the time scheduled. Provides that every contract the Department enters into with a managed care organization shall also provide that if after 3 attempts the managed care organization is unable to make contact with the Medicaid enrollee, then the Medicaid enrollee shall be removed from the managed care organization's health plan and enrolled in the State's Medicaid fee-for-service program.
Title
MEDICAID-MCO-HEALTH ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To HS Medicaid Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3894&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3894.htm |