IL HB3885 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Conviction History Reporting Act. Prohibits a consumer reporting agency from reporting in a criminal history report (1) criminal history information that antedates the report by more than 5 years and (2) criminal history record information that is not conviction information. Authorizes the recovery of damages, punitive damages, and attorney's fees. Effective immediately.
Title
CONVICTION HISTORY REPORT ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |