IL HB3882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, in imposing a sentence for an offense that requires a mandatory minimum sentence of imprisonment, the court may sentence the offender to probation or conditional discharge or other non-imprisonment sentence it deems appropriate instead of to a sentence of imprisonment or to a lesser sentence of imprisonment than the minimum sentence of imprisonment provided for the offense if the court finds that the defendant does not pose a risk to public safety and the interest of justice requires the non-imposition of the mandatory sentence of imprisonment or a lesser sentence of imprisonment. Provides that the court must state on the record its reasons for not imposing the minimum sentence of imprisonment or a lesser sentence of imprisonment.
Title
CD CORR-SENTENCING-REDUCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-03-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-15 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |