IL HB3882 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Deletes a subsection regarding petitions to reorganize park districts located in 2 municipalities, one with a population of less than 500, that expired on January 1, 1987.
Title
PARK DIST-PETITIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0016 |
2015-07-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 006-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 2-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |