IL HB3872 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no spouse of a member of the General Assembly shall be appointed to a board, commission, authority, task force, or other similar body authorized or created by State law if such appointment offers compensation for service as a member of that body. Specifies that this requirement shall only apply to persons appointed to a board, commission, authority, task force, or other similar body on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
GA MEMBER SPOUSE APPOINTEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-02-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 3A-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3872&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3872.htm |