IL HB3866 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of criminal transmission of a sexually transmissible disease. Provides that a person commits criminal transmission of a sexually transmissible disease when he or she, knowing that he or she is infected with a sexually transmissible disease, other than HIV, engages in sexual activity with another without the use of a condom knowing that he or she is infected with a sexually transmissible disease, other than HIV. Provides that a violation is a Class B misdemeanor. Defines "sexually transmissible disease". Amends the Children and Family Services Act, the Child Care Act of 1969, the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963, and the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes.
Title
CRIM TRANSMISSION -SEX DISEASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-15 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-16.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-5.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 115-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 115-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3866&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3866.htm |