IL HB3841 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. In a provision that requires a facility to conduct a criminal history background check for all persons age 18 or older seeking admission to the facility, provides that a facility is not required to conduct the criminal history background check if a criminal history background check was completed by the facility the resident resided at prior to seeking admission to the facility and the resident was transferred to the facility with no time passing during which the resident was not institutionalized.
Title
NURS HM-RESID BACKGROUND CHECK
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0453 |
2015-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2015 |
2015-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 069-039-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-031-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 2-201.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |