IL HB3821 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that the Task Force shall include one member (rather than 2 members) from an organization with expertise in the child welfare system that advocates to preserve and reunify families, appointed by the Governor's Office; 2 members who provide legal representation on behalf of the State of Illinois in child protection cases, one from the Cook County State's Attorney's Office, appointed by the Governor's Office, and one from a State's Attorney's office outside of Cook County, appointed by the Governor's Office; and one member from a statewide organization advocating for the advancement of civil liberties for at least 80 years in Illinois, appointed by the Governor's Office. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall facilitate the prompt and timely collection and provision of data as requested by or on behalf of the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to explore policies and protocols that honor language, culture, and heritage in identity formation and familial relationships, including, but not limited to, race-blind child protection screenings and child removal reviews, as implemented in other jurisdictions around the United States, and to make recommendations for implementation in Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-RACIAL DISPROPORTIONALITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0506 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |