IL HB3820 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure and Employment of Teachers Articles of the School Code. Provides that no one may be licensed to teach or supervise or be otherwise employed in the public schools of this State who is not at least 19 (instead of 20) years of age. Makes changes concerning a career and technical educator endorsement, a part-time provisional career and technical educator endorsement, and a provisional career and technical educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations; the minimum requirements for educators trained in other states or countries; and Professional Educator License renewal. In provisions concerning the termination of contractual continued service by a teacher, provides that any teacher terminating service not in accordance with those provisions may be publicly reprimanded (rather than being guilty of unprofessional conduct and liable to suspension of licensure for a period not to exceed one year). Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR LICENSURE
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0013 |
2017-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |