IL HB3803 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Changes the offense of unlawful contact with streetgang members to unlawful participation in streetgang related activity. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she knowingly commits any act in furtherance of streetgang related activity (rather than has direct or indirect contact with a streetgang member). Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
CRIM CD-PARTIC GANG ACTIVITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0279 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-048-001 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 25-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 25-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |