IL HB3793 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following changes: Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services may immediately restrict or terminate parent-child contact or sibling contacts, without either amending the parent-child visiting plan or the sibling contact plan or obtaining a court order, where the Department or its assigns reasonably believe there is an immediate need to protect the child's health, safety, and welfare. Provides that such restrictions or terminations must be based on available facts to the Department and its assigns when viewed in light of the surrounding circumstances and shall only occur on an individual case-by-case basis.
Title
JUV CT-DCFS-VISITATION BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0502 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |