IL HB3793 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish family centers throughout this State to provide counseling and mental health services to families who are indigent based on any behavior or mental health condition as determined by Department rule. Provides that the Department shall employ or contract with psychiatrists, clinical psychologists, clinical social workers, and licensed marriage and family therapists to provide those services.
Title
MHDDSA-FAMILY COUNSELING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 020-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 80 | 7-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 80 | Art. VII heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3793&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3793.htm |