IL HB3792 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Legislative Ethics Commission for its FY15 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
$LEG ETHICS COMM-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 5 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 005-107-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan; -Rep. Fred Crespo |
2014-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |