IL HB3773 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Further amends the Employment Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation: (1) with respect to recruitment, hiring, promotion, renewal of employment, selection for training or apprenticeship, discharge, discipline, tenure, or the terms, privileges, or conditions of employment, for an employer to use artificial intelligence that has the effect of subjecting employees to discrimination on the basis of protected classes identified under the Article or to use zip codes as a proxy for protected classes identified under the Article; and (2) for an employer to fail to provide notice to an employee that the employer is using artificial intelligence. Defines "artificial intelligence" and "generative artificial intelligence". Removes the amendatory changes to the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes other changes. Adds a January 1, 2026 effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIMIT PREDICTIVE ANALYTICS USE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2024-05-24HouseHouse Concurs
2024-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 100-015-000
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
2024-05-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2024-05-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2024-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
2024-05-15HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2024-05-15HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2024-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2024-05-15HouseArrived in House
2024-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2024-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cervantes
2024-05-15SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2024-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2024-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
2024-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2024-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2024-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2024-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
2024-05-08SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000
2024-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2024-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
2024-04-30SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2024-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2024-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2024-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2024-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
2024-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2024-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 029-000-000
2024-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2024-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2024-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
2024-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled
2024-04-03HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000
2024-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2024-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2024-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2024-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77552-101Amended CodeCitation Text
77552-102Amended CodeCitation Text
8155052BBBBNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3773&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773eng.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773enr.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773ham001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773ham002.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773ham003.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773sam001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773sam002.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3773sam003.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/house/10300HB3773_04192024_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/senate/10300HB3773_05152024_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/house/10300HB3773sam003_05242024_021000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback