IL HB3773 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2019, as follows: General Funds $29,066,700; Other State Funds $5,291,000; Federal Funds $5,500,000; Total $39,857,700.
Title
$FY20 BHE OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3773&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB3773.pdf |