IL HB3757 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable year 2017 and thereafter, the maximum amount of the senior citizens homestead exemption is $7,500 (currently, $5,000). Creates an abatement against property taxes levied by a township for property that (i) is included in a neighborhood association that maintains the roads or sidewalks serving the property or (ii) is located in a municipality that maintains the roads or sidewalks serving the property. Amends the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act. Provides that the income limitation under the Act is $75,000 for tax year 2017 and thereafter.
Title
PROP TX-SENIORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3757&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3757.htm |