IL HB3752 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the Governor shall annually designate, by official proclamation, the third Friday in March as Robotics Day to encourage students and school districts to engage in robotics-based activities and to engage students with the study of mathematics and science.
Title
ROBOTICS DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D" Davidsmeyer |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |